MD HB1465 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a collector of property taxes to withhold from tax sale any residential property when the total taxes due on the property amount to less than $750; requiring a certain mailing sent by a collector of property taxes to the owner of a property before the property is advertised for tax sale to include a separate insert that includes certain information about how a homeowner may access certain services and programs that may assist the homeowner to avoid tax sale costs or foreclosure; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Sales - Homeowner Protections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58
2018-03-30HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {615265/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-27HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback