MD HB1464 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a school employee, in Prince George's County, to report any person to the Prince George's County Department of Social Services for neglect of a child if the person has legal custody or care and control of a child who is between the ages of 5 and 17 and fails to see that the child attends school or receives certain instruction; providing that a certain criminal penalty does not apply in Prince George's County; etc.
Title
Prince George's County - Truancy Violations - Reporting of Neglect PG 515-18
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-16 | House | Reassigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Child Custody
Education
Education - Local Bills
Family Law
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Prince George's County
Public Employees
Reports
Social Services
Teachers
Truancy
Child Custody
Education
Education - Local Bills
Family Law
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Prince George's County
Public Employees
Reports
Social Services
Teachers
Truancy