MD HB1463 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 to change the name of a specified grantee from Prince George's VFD to the Prince George's County Fire Department; adding the Marlboro Volunteer Fire Department, the Beltsville Volunteer Fire Department, the Hyattsville Volunteer Fire Department, the Kentland Volunteer Fire Department, and the Laurel Volunteer Fire Department as grantees to a specified grant; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Prince George's County -

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Griffith) Adopted (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-02 Approved by the Governor
2012-04-05 Third Reading Passed (47-0)
2012-04-04 Second Reading Passed
2012-04-04 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-04-09 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2012-04-07 Re-referred Budget and Taxation
2012-03-29 First Reading Senate Rules
2012-04-06 Returned Passed
2012-03-29 Third Reading Passed (135-0)
2012-03-28 Second Reading Passed
2012-03-28 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-04-02 Favorable Report by Appropriations
2012-03-14 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-03-13 Re-referred Appropriations
2012-03-09 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
2012-03-09 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Griffith) Adopted (135-0)
2012-03-09 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback