MD HB1462 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the name of the Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education to be the Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program; authorizing food service facilities to store and make available for administration auto-injectable epinephrine for individuals who are experiencing or are believed to be experiencing anaphylaxis when a physician or emergency medical services are not immediately available; altering the purpose of the Program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-15SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-14HouseHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB477 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General137A-05(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General137A-06(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General13-7A01(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General13-7A07(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General13-7A2(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General13-7A3(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General13-7A4(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General13-7A8(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General13-7A9(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback