MD HB1462 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing specified exceptions to a specified prohibition on the practice of veterinary medicine and dispensing specified medication that is not in a specified manufacturer's container for a person who sells or dispenses specified medication in a container with a label showing specified information for use by a specified nonfarm animal and for a licensed veterinarian who dispenses specified compounded preparations to be used for a specified nonfarm animal under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Veterinarians, Pharmacies, and Pharmacists - Dispensing Compounded Preparations for Use by Nonfarm Animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {456586/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-19 | House | Reassigned to Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-18 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Animals
Drugs
Health Occupations
Labeling
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Rules and Regulations
Veterinarians
Animals
Drugs
Health Occupations
Labeling
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Rules and Regulations
Veterinarians