MD HB146 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 742
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 742
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "reportable offense" to include only offenses that occurred off school premises, that did not occur at events sponsored by the school, and that involved certain crimes of violence; requiring the State Department of Education to issue a report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 30 each year containing certain information about reportable offenses; requiring each county board of education to report annually to the Department information on certain school disruptions; etc.
Title
Education - Reportable Offenses, Student Discipline, and School Disruptions - Presence of an Attorney and Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 110 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 110 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 742 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-31) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-1) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {313820/1 Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (110-17) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Grammer) Withdrawn |
2022-03-19 | House | Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Grammer) Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {823026/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-01-20 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2021-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Age
Arrests
Attorneys
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Disabilities
Discipline
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Gender
Identification
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minorities
Minors
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Schools
Reports
School Administration
Students
Time
Truancy
Arrests
Attorneys
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Disabilities
Discipline
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Gender
Identification
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Minorities
Minors
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Schools
Reports
School Administration
Students
Time
Truancy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 26 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |