MD HB1459 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from causing the serious physical injury or death of a vulnerable individual as a result of the person operating a vehicle in a careless or distracted manner or in violation of any other rules of the road provisions of the Maryland Vehicle Law; establishing that a person convicted of a violation of the Act may be fined up to $2,000 and must appear in court and may not prepay the fine; establishing additional penalties of participation in a motor vehicle safety course and up to 150 hours of community service; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2020-03-04HouseHearing canceled
2020-03-02HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-26HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation
2020-02-26HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation11101(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation11145(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation21901.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback