MD HB1458 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland College Collaboration for Student Veterans Commission; providing that the purpose of the Commission is to work to ensure the educational success of returning veterans, facilitate the sharing of best practices among institutions of higher education, and work with institutions of higher education to provide specified services to veterans; requiring the Commission to meet at least four times each year; etc.
Title
Maryland College Collaboration for Student Veterans Commission
Sponsors
Del. Pat Young [D] | Del. Darryl Barnes [D] | Sen. Benjamin Brooks [D] | Sen. Michael Jackson [D] |
Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] | Del. David Vogt [R] | Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2016-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2016-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {724763/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2016-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Associations
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Education
Higher Education
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans
Associations
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Education
Higher Education
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans