MD HB1456 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain law enforcement agencies to report certain information annually to the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission and the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention; authorizing the Commission and the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to notify the Comptroller regarding the failure of a certain law enforcement agency to submit certain information; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law Enforcement Agencies - Reporting Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06HouseUnfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
2020-03-04HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety3507(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3518(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback