MD HB1455 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to encourage the establishment and expansion of makerspaces throughout the State; authorizing the Corporation to award certain financial assistance to local governments, certain designees of local governments, and certain nonprofit entities for the establishment of makerspaces in the State; requiring the Corporation, after consulting with the Secretary of Commerce, to adopt certain standards; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Finance Budget and Taxation
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {765060/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB826 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-13 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Economic Development10401(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10496(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development9101(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback