MD HB1455 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, in Baltimore City, specified positions or classifications or public school employees in specified positions or classifications that on January 1, 2009, were a part of a unit represented by a specified employee organization shall remain in that unit; authorizing a specified public school employer, in negotiations with an employee organization representing both supervisory and nonsupervisory employees, to create two units to be represented by the same employee organization; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Public School Employees - Representation by Employee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-22 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2010-02-25 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB1455.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb1455f.pdf |