MD HB1453 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 76-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing certain criteria for qualified offshore wind projects applied for on or after January 1, 2020; altering and extending the minimum required percentage of energy that must be derived from Tier 1 renewable sources in the State's renewable energy portfolio standard in certain years; altering and extending the minimum required percentage of Tier 1 renewable energy that must be derived from solar energy in the State's renewable energy portfolio standard in certain years; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2018

Sponsors

Del. William Frick [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Bilal Ali [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]
Del. Angela Angel [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]
Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Pamela Beidle [D]
Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]
Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]Del. Angela Gibson [D]
Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Antonio Hayes [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]
Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Sheila Hixson [D]
Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]
Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Tony Knotts [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]
Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Clarence Lam [D]
Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]
Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Aruna Miller [D]Del. David Moon [D]Del. Marice Morales [D]
Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]
Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D]
Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]
Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]
Del. Mary Washington [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Pat Young [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
2018-03-05HouseHearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback