MD HB1452 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Office of Recycling in the Department of the Environment to promote the development of markets for recycled materials and recycled products in the State in a certain manner; requiring that the annual Maryland solid waste management and diversion report be submitted to the General Assembly by September 1, 2021, and each year thereafter, and include certain activities; requiring the Office to coordinate certain activities with certain entities; requiring certain departments to report certain information to the Office; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {540319/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment91702(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment91702.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback