MD HB1452 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a certain authorized provider to attest on the registration form to the Maryland Department of Health that the authorized provider completed 2 hours of continuing education before the authorized provider may be registered by the Department or renew a certain registration to dispense a controlled dangerous substance; requiring certain continuing education be related to the prescribing or dispensing of controlled dangerous substances and be recognized by certain licensing or accrediting entities; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled Dangerous Substances Registration – Authorized Providers – Continuing Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 213
2018-03-26HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-23SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-22SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {456286/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-07HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback