MD HB1451 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, beginning on October 1, 2023, that each school bus purchased by a county board of education be a zero-emission vehicle; requiring, beginning on October 1, 2026, that each school bus purchased by a certain person for use under a certain contract with a county board be a zero-emission vehicle; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Bus Purchasing – Zero–Emission Vehicle – Requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation2901(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation2902(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation2903(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation2904(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback