MD HB1450 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the privileges of Class B beer, wine, and liquor hotel and restaurant licenses issued in Washington County so that the privileges may be exercised for on- and off-premises consumption for licenses that had on- and off-sale privileges on or before June 30, 2016, and for on-premises consumption only for all other licenses; and requiring the license holder to notify the Board before constructing or altering an area on the premises where beer, wine, and liquor are sold.
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel and Motel Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {503297/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Notices
Restaurants
Washington County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Notices
Restaurants
Washington County