MD HB145 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, rather than authorizing, the Department of Natural Resources to suspend a certain tidal fish license on conviction of the license holder for a certain violation; requiring a certain person who has a tidal fish license suspended under the Act to complete a certain class at the person's expense; prohibiting a person who has a seafood dealer authorization from purchasing, offering to purchase, or possessing oysters that were unlawfully harvested from a certain lease under certain circumstances; providing certain penalties; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlawful Taking of Oysters From Submerged Land Leases, Aquaculture Leases, and Water Column Leases – Penalties

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2020-07-07HousePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Law7104(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources411A-16(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources41201(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback