MD HB1447 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Information Technology to conduct a certain review of certain information technology platforms used by certain health occupations boards and make certain recommendations on the feasibility and cost of developing a certain common information technology platform; and requiring the Department to report certain findings and recommendations to the Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee on or before December 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2020-03-10HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-09HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB1045 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback