MD HB1446 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 475
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 475
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the subject matter of the continuing education ethics course required for the renewal of a license to provide real estate brokerage services by the State Real Estate Commission; and requiring the course to cover the subjects of the practice of flipping, fraudulent real estate practices, and professionalism as it relates to the Maryland Code of Ethics, including a discussion relating to conflict resolution and a licensee's duty to respect the public, peers, and property.
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Continuing Education Requirements - Ethics and Professionalism
Sponsors
Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Carl Anderton [R] | Del. Ned Carey [D] | Del. Dan Cox [R] |
Del. Jay Jacobs [R] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Del. Bob Long [R] | Del. Michael Malone [R] |
Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. April Rose [R] | Del. Haven Shoemaker [R] |
Del. Veronica Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 475 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-3) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {353099/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB350 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 476
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Ethics
Fraud
Licenses
Real Estate
Time
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Ethics
Fraud
Licenses
Real Estate
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Occupations and Professions | 17 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |