MD HB1443 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Hearing: Mar 6 @ 1:00 pm House Ways and Means Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment; requiring the Commission to study, evaluate, update, and revise guidelines for student behavioral health treatment and practices in general, including school-based health centers; requiring the Commission to make recommendations to improve current practices and revise guidelines for student behavioral health treatment and to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020, and December 1, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB896 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback