MD HB1442 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 471
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "expanded polystyrene food service product" to exclude certain egg cartons shipped into the State for packaging or cartons of eggs that have been packaged within the State for sale within the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Definition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 471
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-17SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {840414/1 Adopted
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB840 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 472

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment92201(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment92203(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback