MD HB1441 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the requirement that the Maryland Tourism Development Board provide grants to certain tourism organizations by including nongovernmental tourism organizations as authorized recipients of grants from the Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development - Maryland Tourism Development Board - Grants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
2020-02-25HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Economic Development4201(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development4214(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback