MD HB1440 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB361
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering for certain taxable years a certain limitation on a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain military retirement income; providing the subtraction for the tax year beginning after December 31, 2021, but before January 1, 2023, is the greater of $15,000 or 50% of the amount of military retirement income received during that taxable year; and providing that for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2022, all military retirement income received can be subtracted.
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Military Retirement (Tax Relief for Military Retirees Act of 2022)
Sponsors
Del. Sid Saab [R] | Del. Seth Howard [R] | Del. Rachel Munoz [R] | Del. Mike Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
HB361 (Carry Over) 2020-01-24 - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1440?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb1440f.pdf |