MD HB1440 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to make available to opioid treatment programs monthly transit passes that are for use by patients of opioid treatment programs who qualify for the administration's Disabled Reduced Fare Program and may be issued to patients on site at opioid treatment programs by staff; requiring the passes to be made available at a reduced price that reflects the price of a monthly pass issued under the Disabled Reduced Fare Program as of October 1, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Transit Administration - Disabled Reduced Fare Program - Opioid Treatment Program Patients

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (130-4)
2020-03-15HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB705 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 577

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation7712(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback