MD HB1440 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to make available to opioid treatment programs monthly transit passes that are for use by patients of opioid treatment programs who qualify for the administration's Disabled Reduced Fare Program and may be issued to patients on site at opioid treatment programs by staff; requiring the passes to be made available at a reduced price that reflects the price of a monthly pass issued under the Disabled Reduced Fare Program as of October 1, 2020; etc.
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Disabled Reduced Fare Program - Opioid Treatment Program Patients
Sponsors
Del. Melissa Wells [D] | Del. Tony Bridges [D] | Del. Jon Cardin [D] | Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D] |
Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] | Del. Nick Mosby [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-4) |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB705 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 577
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Commuters
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Disabilities
Mass Transit
Medical Treatments
Opioids
Patients
Prices
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Transportation - Generally
Commuters
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Disabilities
Mass Transit
Medical Treatments
Opioids
Patients
Prices
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Transportation - Generally
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 7 | 712 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |