MD HB144 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB422
Note: Carry Over of previous HB957
Note: Carry Over of previous HB957
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-04 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-04 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that certain motor fuel tax rates be adjusted in future years based on growth in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers.
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsors
Del. Matt Morgan [R] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Lauren Arikan [R] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] |
Del. Jerry Clark [R] | Del. Dan Cox [R] | Del. Mark Fisher [R] | Del. Wayne Hartman [R] |
Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Del. Teresa Reilly [R] | Del. Sid Saab [R] |
Del. Kathy Szeliga [R] | Del. Brenda Thiam [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-04 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2021-10-22 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB144 (Carry Over) 2022-01-04 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
HB957 (Carry Over) 2018-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
SB337 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-26 - Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
HB957 (Carry Over) 2018-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
SB337 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-26 - Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 9 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0144?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0144f.pdf |