MD HB1437 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which a licensed direct-entry midwife is prohibited from assuming or continuing to take responsibility for a patient's pregnancy and birth care and is required to arrange for the orderly transfer of care of the patient; altering the circumstances under which a licensed direct-entry midwife is required to consult with a health care practitioner; etc.
Title
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528 |
2018-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {566080/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Diseases
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Licenses
Midwives
Nurses
Pregnancy
Diseases
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Licenses
Midwives
Nurses
Pregnancy