MD HB1435 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that a certain individual who has completed training in an approved alcohol awareness program be present on a licensed premises at certain times; authorizing the trained individual to be absent from the licensed premises for up to 2 hours for certain reasons; requiring the local licensing board to require the license holder to keep a log book documenting certain details of the absence in a certain form; altering certain penalties related to alcohol awareness training; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverages - Retail License Holders - Alcohol Awareness Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2020-03-03HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-02HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages3504(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback