MD HB1432 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring health care providers to prescribe the lowest effective dose of an opioid and in a quantity no greater than the quantity needed for the expected duration of specified pain unless the opioid is prescribed to treat a specified disorder or specified pain; requiring the dosage, quantity, and duration of specified prescribed opioids to be based on an evidence-based clinical guideline for prescribing controlled dangerous substances; authorizing specified disciplinary action by health occupations boards; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Providers - Prescription Opioids - Limits on Prescribing (The Prescriber Limits Act of 2017)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 570
2017-04-10HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-04-10SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-10SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-07SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-04-06SenateHearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-04-06SenateReassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-04-06SenateHearing canceled
2017-04-06SenateHearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-04-05SenateRereferred to Finance
2017-04-05SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2017-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2017-03-31HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-31HouseFavorable with Amendments {526580/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-31HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2017-03-07HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1432&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1432f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1432t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_570_hb1432t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0002/hb1432_52658001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb1432.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb1432_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb1432_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1432,h-1084&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1432,s-1451&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback