MD HB1430 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "proceeds" to allow a video lottery operator, under certain circumstances, to reduce the amount of proceeds received from video lottery terminals and table games by the amount of certain uncollectible negotiable instruments for up to 7 days following a certain determination; requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to adopt certain regulations; requiring the video lottery operator to provide a quarterly report to certain committees regarding certain uncollectible or forgiven debts; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 113 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (113-21)
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {625161/1 Adopted
2020-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-24HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-24HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government91A-01(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-26(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback