MD HB1429 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing rules for public school athletic schedules for basketball; prohibiting a team, except under certain circumstances, from playing more than two games each week; providing that the basketball schedule consists of 20 regular season games for a team that elects to play in a tournament or showcase game and 22 regular season games for other teams; authorizing a team to play in up to four tournament games in a year; authorizing each county board to decide whether to authorize a team to play in showcase games; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education – Public School Athletics – Basketball Schedule

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {505365/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-11HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7125(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback