MD HB1429 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB343
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing rules for public school athletic schedules for basketball; prohibiting a team, except under certain circumstances, from playing more than two games each week; providing that the basketball schedule consists of 20 regular season games for a team that elects to play in a tournament or showcase game and 22 regular season games for other teams; authorizing a team to play in up to four tournament games in a year; authorizing each county board to decide whether to authorize a team to play in showcase games; etc.
Title
Education – Public School Athletics – Basketball Schedule
Sponsors
Del. Nick Mosby [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {505365/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB1429 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs