MD HB1428 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, by May 31, 2019, the Board of Directors of the University of Maryland Medical System Corporation to adopt a certain conflict of interest policy; requiring annual financial disclosures; requiring the Board to ensure that the Corporation continues to be a private, nonprofit, nonstock corporation; altering the composition of, and the appointment process for, the Board; prohibiting inclusion of a State or local elected official; prohibiting a member of the Board from intentionally using the prestige of office for private gain; etc.
Title
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19 |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {287775/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {916486/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-21 | House | Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-0) |
2019-03-21 | House | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-0) |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Accountants
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contracts
Corporations
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Emergency Bills
Ethics
General Assembly
Governor
Health Care Facilities
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Higher Education
Hospitals
internet
Legislative Services, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Procurement
Public Information
Public Officials
Public Works, Board of
Records
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Voting
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contracts
Corporations
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Emergency Bills
Ethics
General Assembly
Governor
Health Care Facilities
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Higher Education
Hospitals
internet
Legislative Services, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Procurement
Public Information
Public Officials
Public Works, Board of
Records
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Voting