MD HB1428 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt regulations to require that certain stormwater management infrastructure for a development or redevelopment project in a certain locally designated historic district be designed in a manner to protect the physical integrity of the stormwater management infrastructure during a 100-year storm event; and defining "qualified historic district" and "repetitive loss property".
Title
Environment - Stormwater Management Infrastructure - Historic Districts
Sponsors
Del. Bob Flanagan [R] | Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. James Gilchrist [D] |
Del. Anne Healey [D] | Del. Herbert McMillan [R] | Del. Charles Otto [R] | Del. Shane Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2018-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {100817/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Death
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
Historical Matters
Public Works
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Water
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
Historical Matters
Public Works
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Water