MD HB1427 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting a certain child or surviving spouse of a certain veteran of the United States armed forces from paying tuition at a public institution of higher education; providing the eligibility criteria for receiving the exemption; requiring the institutions to report to the Maryland Higher Education Commission each year; requiring the Commission to report to the General Assembly each year; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Tuition Exemption - Spouses and Dependents of Disabled Veterans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
2020-03-02HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education15106.11(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback