MD HB1427 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the application of certain design and siting criteria established by the Coast Smart Council to apply only to certain State and local capital projects; extending the date the projects must comply with the criteria to July 1, 2020, and the date certain local jurisdictions must develop a plan to address certain nuisance flooding to October 1, 2020; requiring the Department of Planning, by October 1, 2019, to develop guidelines to assist local jurisdictions in data collection to establish nuisance flooding baselines; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and Mitigation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (106-28) (Y: 106 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Stein) Adopted (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2019-04-08SenateMotion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-04-08SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-04-05SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (106-28)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-27HouseHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-26HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation
2019-03-15HouseReferred House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-15HouseMotion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Stein) Adopted (136-0)
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback