MD HB1425 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to prepare certain studies and, subject to the approval of the Board of Public Works, develop certain supplemental facilities and supplemental facility sites within Baltimore City that directly or indirectly benefit the sports facilities at Camden Yards; requiring certain notice to the governing body of Baltimore City; authorizing the Authority to issue certain bonds; establishing the Supplemental Facilities Fund to pay expenses related to a supplemental facility; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Stadium Authority - Development of Supplemental Facilities to Benefit Camden Yards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 221
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-07HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-07HouseHearing canceled
2019-03-07HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-06HouseReferred Appropriations
2019-03-06HouseMotion Rules Suspended Referred (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0)
2019-03-06HouseMotion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (138-0)
2019-03-06HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback