MD HB1425 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring penalties recovered by State agencies, and specified other penalties collected for violations of sediment control laws, to be deposited in the Maryland Clean Water Fund; repealing the Sewage Sludge Utilization Fund and requiring specified fees, funds, penalties, and fines to be deposited in the Maryland Clean Water Fund; requiring specified expenditures for the emergency removal of sewage sludge to be reimbursed to the Department of the Environment by the sewage sludge utilizer under specified circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of the Environment - Consolidation and Administration of

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-04 Approved by the Governor
2010-04-07 Third Reading Passed (47-0)
2010-04-06 Second Reading Passed
2010-04-06 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-04-09 Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2010-03-31 Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-03-27 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2010-04-07 Returned Passed
2010-03-25 Third Reading Passed (140-0)
2010-03-24 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-24 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-03-27 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2010-03-10 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-03-08 Re-referred Environmental Matters
2010-02-23 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback