MD HB1424 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Third Reading Passed (97-37)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Public-Private Partnership Oversight Review Board; requiring a certain reporting agency to include in presolicitation reports for certain public-private partnerships presolicitation reports of certain contracts and a certain environmental impact statement under certain circumstances; requiring certain presolicitation reports to be submitted to the Legislative Policy Committee; prohibiting the Board of Public Works, under certain circumstances, from designating a public-private partnership; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public-Private Partnerships - Process and Oversight

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Floor Amendment 413228/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 93 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (97-37)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFloor Amendment {413228/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (38-93)
2020-03-16HouseMotion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted
2020-03-15HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {930614/1 Adopted
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement10A101(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement10A106(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement10A201(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement10A203(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement10A301(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement10A401(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback