MD HB1424 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, except under certain circumstances, the performance or inducement or attempted performance or inducement of an abortion unless a certain determination as to the probable age of the unborn child is made by a certain physician; providing that the failure of a physician to perform certain actions is deemed "unprofessional conduct"; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to adopt certain regulations on or before January 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Abortion
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Courts
Damages
Death
Disclosure
Emergencies
Evidence
Fines
Fraud
Health
Health, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Pregnancy
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Time
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Courts
Damages
Death
Disclosure
Emergencies
Evidence
Fines
Fraud
Health
Health, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Pregnancy
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Time