MD HB1422 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from committing certain acts while operating a motor vehicle in a highway work zone or on a bridge or highway that is under construction if a highway worker is present; providing that a person may not be convicted for a violation under the Act if the violation was due to a mechanical failure of the vehicle or the negligence of a highway worker or another person; establishing certain penalties for certain violations of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicles - Highway Worker Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation
2019-03-04HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback