MD HB1422 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a 7-day Class B-BB (bed and breakfast) on-sale beer, wine, and liquor license in Caroline County; authorizing the license holder to sell alcoholic beverages to guests of certain catered events; authorizing the license holder to allow certain guests to consume personal alcoholic beverages on the premises under certain circumstances; specifying that, except during catered events or ticketed events hosted by the license holder, the license does not authorize the sale of alcoholic beverages to certain individuals; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 242
2018-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {543398/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-02-19HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback