MD HB1420 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 470
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 470
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the family income threshold at which a hospital's financial assistance policy must provide free and reduced cost medically necessary care to patients; requiring that a certain financial assistance policy include a certain payment plan, available to uninsured patients with family income between 200% and 500% of the federal poverty level and a certain mechanism for a patient to request a reconsideration; requiring that a certain financial assistance policy provide presumptive eligibility for certain care; etc.
Title
Hospitals - Financial Assistance Policies and Bill Collections
Sponsors
Del. Robbyn Lewis [D] | Del. Erek Barron [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D] |
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] | Del. Sheila Ruth [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 470 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {786781/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB875 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Courts
Damages
Data
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Evidence
Examinations
Fines
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Housing
Injury
Inspections
internet
Jurisdiction
Language
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Poverty
Public Information
Records
Reports
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services
Spouses
State Aid
Support of Dependents
Unfair Trade Practices
Welfare
Youth
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Courts
Damages
Data
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Evidence
Examinations
Fines
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Housing
Injury
Inspections
internet
Jurisdiction
Language
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Poverty
Public Information
Records
Reports
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services
Spouses
State Aid
Support of Dependents
Unfair Trade Practices
Welfare
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 214.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 214.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |