MD HB1420 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; renaming the State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners, altering the membership of the State Board of Chiropractic Examiners, and transferring specified authority to license massage therapists and register massage practitioners to the State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners; etc.
Title
State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Licensure, Registration, and Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-3) (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-3) (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739 |
2016-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (President) Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-3) |
2016-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Advertising
Appeals
Chiropractors
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Criminal Background Investigations
Education
Examinations
Fees
Fraud
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Hearings
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Massage
Municipal Corporations
Names
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Solicitation
Appeals
Chiropractors
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Criminal Background Investigations
Education
Examinations
Fees
Fraud
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Hearings
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Massage
Municipal Corporations
Names
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Solicitation