MD HB1418 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring an insurer that issues or delivers in the State a policy of motor vehicle liability insurance that provides coverage for the repair of physical damage to the insured motor vehicle to provide in the policy that the insured has the option of requiring repairs to be made to the insured motor vehicle using genuine crash parts, certified aftermarket crash parts, or aftermarket crash parts; authorizing the insured to consent in a certain manner to the use of certain aftermarket crash parts; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
2020-03-12HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance27908(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback