MD HB1416 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Charles County to grant, by law, a tax credit against the property tax imposed on the owner-occupied residence of certain emergency responders and their surviving spouses.
Title
Charles County - Property Tax - Credit for Volunteer Emergency Responders
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2022-02-17 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Charles County
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Rescue Squads
Residential Property
Spouses
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Volunteers
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Rescue Squads
Residential Property
Spouses
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Volunteers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |