MD HB1416 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a supplier of water to inspect certain valves in a public water system in a certain manner, repair or replace certain valves, inspect certain fire hydrants, formulate and implement a certain plan, identify the locations of certain valves, and record certain characteristics and identifiers of certain valves; requiring a supplier of water to develop a certain cybersecurity program by February 1, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Water Systems - Supplier Requirements (Water Quality Accountability Act of 2020)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB820 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment9401(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9429(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9430(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9431(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9432(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9433(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9434(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9435(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9436(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9437(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback