MD HB1416 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a supplier of water to inspect certain valves in a public water system in a certain manner, repair or replace certain valves, inspect certain fire hydrants, formulate and implement a certain plan, identify the locations of certain valves, and record certain characteristics and identifiers of certain valves; requiring a supplier of water to develop a certain cybersecurity program by February 1, 2021; etc.
Title
Public Water Systems - Supplier Requirements (Water Quality Accountability Act of 2020)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB820 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Capital Budgets
Certifications
Cybersecurity
Data
Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Engineers
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Equipment
Fire Protection
Health Care Facilities
Hospitals
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Inspections
Notices
Nursing Homes
Public Information
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Utilities
Water
Weights and Measures
Certifications
Cybersecurity
Data
Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Engineers
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Equipment
Fire Protection
Health Care Facilities
Hospitals
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Inspections
Notices
Nursing Homes
Public Information
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Utilities
Water
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 429 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 430 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 431 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 432 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 433 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 434 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 435 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 436 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 437 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |