MD HB1415 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defining "agricultural land management practices" as it relates to exemptions from the requirement to develop and adhere to a grading and sediment control plan under certain circumstances.
Title
Grading and Sediment Control Plans - Agricultural Land Management Practices - Definition
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-17 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 4 | 101.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 4 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |