MD HB1415 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, in collaboration with certain entities, to establish an outreach program and a certain digital recruitment platform to make use of certain media and online resources to implement a marketing campaign to encourage certain individuals to pursue a Maryland professional teacher's certificate; establishing the Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education Fund to assist in providing adequate funding for early childhood, primary, and secondary education in the State; etc.
Title
Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
Sponsors
Del. The Speaker [?] | Del. Anne Kaiser [D] | Del. Maggie McIntosh [D] | Del. Adrienne Jones [D] |
Sen. Alonzo Washington [D] | Del. Eric Luedtke [D] | Del. Brooke Lierman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (113-25) (Y: 114 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (114-22) (Y: 115 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (113-25) (Y: 114 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (114-22) (Y: 115 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361 |
2018-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (113-25) |
2018-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {434234/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (114-22) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {385964/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations |
Subjects
Apprentices
Appropriations
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Comptroller
Curriculum
Data
Demographics
Disabilities
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Grants
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Licenses
Literacy
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Appropriations
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Comptroller
Curriculum
Data
Demographics
Disabilities
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Grants
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Licenses
Literacy
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology